Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4464 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/15/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule