House | 05/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 353 | |
House | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 353 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |