Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4662 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025 10:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 10 2025 3:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 10 2025 2:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/14/2025 10:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 10 2025 3:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 10 2025 2:16PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars