Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 12, 2025
Bill March 12, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 28, 2025
Bill April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025