Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1492
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1492
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1423
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#385
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#332
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Record vote RV#332
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1608
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Amended
|
1-K. Bell
|
Journal Page: 1607
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Record vote RV#331
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Amended 1-K. Bell
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|