Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4730 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/15/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars