House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1541 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Amended | 2-Cain | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | Journal Page: 943 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 943 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |