Senate | 05/06/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1429 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2806 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1837 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 945 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 945 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |