Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4912 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2025
Bill March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025

House Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Analysis May 1, 2025
Witness List May 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 4, 2025