Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1066 | Journal Page: 2376 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2376 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#932 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2246 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2246 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 965 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 965 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |