House | 04/28/2025 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1923 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 487 | Journal Page: 1923 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Postponed | 4/28/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1780 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1780 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Postponed 4/28/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Postponed | 4/24/25 10:00 AM | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1534 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1062 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 358 | |
House | 03/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 358 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |