Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1485 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1905 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1768 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#482 | Journal Page: 1767 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1767 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#482 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#440 | Journal Page: 1709 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#440 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Amended | 2-Isaac | Journal Page: 1708 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#439 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Amended 2-Isaac | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#438 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Amended 1-Troxclair | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1708 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development | Journal Page: 359 | |
House | 03/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 359 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |