Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB517 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 26, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

House Committee Report

Witness List April 1, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025
Fiscal Note April 1, 2025
Bill April 1, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 24, 2025
Fiscal Note April 24, 2025
Bill April 24, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note March 26, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 1, 2025