Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5188 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/23/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 4:28PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 5:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 5:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:11PM
04/23/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 4:28PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 5:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 5:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:11PM