Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 997 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1268 | Journal Page: 2654 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2654 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2654 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2515 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1157 | Journal Page: 2514 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2514 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1157 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended | 1-Wilson | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Amended 1-Wilson | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed | 5/1/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2175 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Postponed 5/1/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1654 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 997 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Filed |