LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB5430
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB5430
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB5430
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/17/2025
10:30 am
Elections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB1968
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2279
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2739
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2803
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3909
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3918
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
HB4253
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4475
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5115
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
HB5430
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/17/2025
10:30 am
Elections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB1968
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2279
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2739
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2803
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3909
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3918
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
HB4253
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4475
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB5115
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
HB5430
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars