Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5483 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/14/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H No action taken in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted