House | 04/28/2025 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1029 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1029 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Filed |