House | 04/30/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2647 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker | Journal Page: 1364 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1364 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Filed |