House | 05/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 1364 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1364 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Filed |