Senate
|
05/08/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Referred to Education K-16
|
|
Journal Page: 1492
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1492
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#217
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Leach
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1395
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#196
|
Journal Page: 1395
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote RV#196
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1395
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
7-Bowers
|
Journal Page: 1394
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amendment withdrawn 7-Bowers
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1394
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote RV#195
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amended
|
6-Olcott
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amended 6-Olcott
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote RV#194
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
5-Wu
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote RV#193
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote RV#192
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote RV#191
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote RV#190
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Amended 1-Leach
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1385
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 295
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 295
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|