LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB648
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB648
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB648
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/26/2025
8:00 am
Trade, Workforce & Economic Development Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.014
HB431
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB648
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB1006
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Motion to reconsider fails
HB1926
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2037
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
HB2468
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB2788
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2791
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB3255
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
HB3260
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House