Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB685 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 25, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

House Committee Report

Analysis April 8, 2025
Bill April 8, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 21, 2025