House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2432 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1137 | Journal Page: 2492 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2492 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1137 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2492 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1096 | Journal Page: 2431 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2431 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1096 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2431 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 386 | |
House | 03/04/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 386 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |