Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB721 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/07/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
04/23/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H No action taken in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/23/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H No action taken in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted