Senate | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1485 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#477 | Journal Page: 1763 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1763 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#477 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1763 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#433 | Journal Page: 1713 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#433 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 405 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 405 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |