Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1130 | Journal Page: 2486 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2486 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1089 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2404 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#1089 | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended | 1-J. Jones | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Amended 1-J. Jones | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 407 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 407 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |