Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1826 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#392 | Journal Page: 1678 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1678 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1613 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#343 | Journal Page: 1625 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1616 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#343 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Amendment tabled | 1-Hopper | Journal Page: 1624 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#342 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 1611 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amendment tabled 1-Hopper | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Hopper | Journal Page: 1611 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1624 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Amendment(s) offered 1-Hopper | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 409 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 409 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |