Senate | 05/05/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 403 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1295 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1189 | Journal Page: 2550 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2550 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1189 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2549 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker | Journal Page: 409 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |