LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB827
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB827
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB827
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/17/2025
8:00 am
Public Health Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.030
HB713
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:27PM
HB827
Introduced
Last Action: 03/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB932
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 1:21PM
HB499
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB510
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB163
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB296
Introduced
Last Action: 03/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB879
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB913
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .