House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed | 10/3/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2557 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2557 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed 10/3/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1063 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 411 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 411 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |