Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB871 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R4633 JBD-F
 By: Reynolds H.B. No. 871




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the residential and commercial building codes of
 municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 214.212(a) and (d), Local Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the
 International Residential Code, as it existed on May 1, 2021
 [2012], is adopted as a municipal residential building code in this
 state.
 (d)  A municipality may review and consider amendments made
 by the International Code Council to the International Residential
 Code after May 1, 2021 [2012].
 SECTION 2.  Sections 214.216(a) and (d), Local Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To protect the public health, safety, and welfare, the
 International Building Code, as it existed on May 1, 2021 [2012], is
 adopted as a municipal commercial building code in this state.
 (d)  A municipality may review and consider amendments made
 by the International Code Council to the International Building
 Code after May 1, 2021 [2012].
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Sections 214.212 and 214.216, Local
 Government Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to residential
 or commercial construction, remodeling, alteration, enlargement,
 or repair that begins under an agreement made on or after January 1,
 2026, or that begins, in the absence of an agreement, on or after
 that date.  Residential or commercial construction, remodeling,
 alteration, enlargement, or repair that begins under an agreement
 made before January 1, 2026, or that begins, in the absence of an
 agreement, before that date is governed by the law in effect when
 the agreement was made or the activity began, as appropriate, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2025, municipalities shall
 establish rules and take other necessary actions to implement
 Sections 214.212 and 214.216, Local Government Code, as amended by
 this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.