LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB876
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB876
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB876
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/19/2025
10:30 am
Delivery of Government Efficiency Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.010
HB150
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB869
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB876
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
HB1043
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
HB1494
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
HB1522
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce