Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB879 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 25, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

House Committee Report

Fiscal Note April 15, 2025
Witness List April 15, 2025
Analysis April 15, 2025
Bill April 15, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note April 29, 2025
Bill April 29, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2025
Fiscal Note April 11, 2025
Fiscal Note March 14, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2025