Senate | 04/16/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1343 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Record vote | RV#167 | Journal Page: 1342 |
House | 04/14/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1342 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Record vote RV#167 | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1362 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 910 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 500 | |
House | 03/06/2025 | Filed |