Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1560 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2031 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#710 | Journal Page: 2030 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2026 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#710 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2021 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred to s/c on State-Federal Relations by Speaker | Journal Page: 500 | |
House | 03/06/2025 | Filed |