Senate | 04/22/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Record vote | RV#297 | Journal Page: 1547 |
House | 04/17/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1548 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1536 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Filed |