Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR20 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/20/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 20




 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The passing of Matthew Travis Stice of Midland on
 October 19, 2024, at the age of 34, has profoundly saddened the many
 people whose lives he touched; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Houston on May 29, 1990, Matthew Stice was
 the beloved son of Brenda and Travis Stice, and he grew up with the
 companionship of his two siblings, Elizabeth and Luke; despite the
 medical challenges he faced from birth, he exuded joy and
 happiness, and he made a deep impression on everyone he encountered
 with his contagious laugh and his purity of spirit; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Stice's many interests included Thomas the Tank
 Engine, old Disney VHS movies, and his prized collection of books,
 and he enjoyed riding his bicycle at Bynum School; he endeared
 himself to countless people, including his teachers and caregivers,
 and he was cherished deeply by his extended family members and
 lifelong friends; and
 WHEREAS, Although his time on this earth was far too brief,
 Matthew Stice was a ray of light in the lives of those who held him
 dear, and he leaves behind a legacy of love that will never be
 forgotten; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Matthew Travis Stice and extend
 sincere condolences to all those who mourn his passing; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Matthew Stice.
 Craddick
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 20 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 10, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 20 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on March 19, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor