Senate | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1604 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1604 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1512 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#549 | Journal Page: 1819 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#549 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1819 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1831 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to s/c on Dis Prev & Women's & Children's Health by Speaker | Journal Page: 416 | |
House | 11/15/2024 | Filed |