Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR49 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.C.R. No. 49
1+89R10429 TBO-D
2+ By: Vasut H.C.R. No. 49
23
34
45
56
6- HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
7+ CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
78 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew to
89 a close with the passing of decorated Vietnam War veteran Clarence
910 Eugene Sasser of Sandy Point on May 13, 2024, at the age of 76; and
1011 WHEREAS, The son of Willie Sasser Jr. and Alice Brown,
1112 Clarence Sasser was born in Chenango on September 2, 1947; he was
1213 raised by his mother and stepfather on a farm in Rosharon, where he
1314 grew up with his siblings and stepsiblings; after graduating from
1415 Marshall High School in 1965, he began studying chemistry at the
1516 University of Houston; he was drafted into the U.S. Army in 1967,
1617 and he served in Vietnam as a medic with the 3rd Battalion, 60th
1718 Infantry, 9th Infantry Division; and
1819 WHEREAS, On January 10, 1968, Private First Class Sasser was
1920 participating in a reconnaissance mission when enemies attacked his
2021 unit, killing more than 30 U.S. service members in the first few
2122 minutes; Private Sasser ran through a hail of bullets to help his
2223 injured comrades, and he continued to provide treatment even after
2324 being severely wounded; once the group had crawled to a safer area,
2425 he tended to the survivors for five hours before they were all
2526 evacuated; he recovered from his injuries in Japan, and he later
2627 accepted an assignment there; along the way, he rose to the rank of
2728 specialist fifth class; and
2829 WHEREAS, In recognition of his courageous actions during the
2930 Vietnam War, Specialist Sasser was presented with the Medal of
3031 Honor by President Richard M. Nixon during a White House ceremony on
3132 March 7, 1969; his other military honors included the Distinguished
3233 Service Cross, Purple Heart, National Defense Service Medal,
3334 Vietnam Service Medal, and Republic of Vietnam Campaign Medal; and
3435 WHEREAS, Mr. Sasser returned to civilian life in June 1969
3536 and continued his chemistry studies at Texas A&M University before
3637 accepting a position at a petrochemical refinery near Houston; he
3738 went on to enjoy a rewarding career as a decision review officer
3839 with the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs; and
3940 WHEREAS, Active in his community, Mr. Sasser was president of
4041 the Northwest Brazoria County Servicemen's Association and a member
4142 of New St. Philip Missionary Baptist Church; among his many
4243 achievements, he was inducted into the Texas A&M Hall of Honor in
4344 2013 and was awarded an honorary doctor of letters degree from the
4445 university; and
4546 WHEREAS, Mr. Sasser shared a fulfilling marriage with his
4647 wife, Ethel, that spanned many years before her passing, and he took
4748 great pride in their three sons, Benjamin Sasser and Rossano
4849 Dickey, who preceded their father in death, and Billy Sasser; and
4950 WHEREAS, Clarence Sasser exemplified the highest ideals of
5051 the U.S. armed forces, and he leaves behind a record of service to
5152 his country that will continue to inspire all those who knew him;
5253 now, therefore, be it
5354 RESOLVED, That the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas
5455 hereby pay tribute to the life of Clarence Eugene Sasser and extend
5556 heartfelt sympathy to his loved ones; and, be it further
5657 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
5758 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
5859 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
5960 Clarence Sasser.
60- Vasut
61- Barry
62- Bonnen
63- ______________________________ ______________________________
64- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
65- I certify that H.C.R. No. 49 was unanimously adopted by a
66- rising vote of the House on March 10, 2025.
67- ______________________________
68- Chief Clerk of the House
69- I certify that H.C.R. No. 49 was unanimously adopted by a
70- rising vote of the Senate on March 19, 2025.
71- ______________________________
72- Secretary of the Senate
73- APPROVED: __________________
74- Date
75- __________________
76- Governor