Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR49 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/20/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 49




 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew to
 a close with the passing of decorated Vietnam War veteran Clarence
 Eugene Sasser of Sandy Point on May 13, 2024, at the age of 76; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Willie Sasser Jr. and Alice Brown,
 Clarence Sasser was born in Chenango on September 2, 1947; he was
 raised by his mother and stepfather on a farm in Rosharon, where he
 grew up with his siblings and stepsiblings; after graduating from
 Marshall High School in 1965, he began studying chemistry at the
 University of Houston; he was drafted into the U.S. Army in 1967,
 and he served in Vietnam as a medic with the 3rd Battalion, 60th
 Infantry, 9th Infantry Division; and
 WHEREAS, On January 10, 1968, Private First Class Sasser was
 participating in a reconnaissance mission when enemies attacked his
 unit, killing more than 30 U.S. service members in the first few
 minutes; Private Sasser ran through a hail of bullets to help his
 injured comrades, and he continued to provide treatment even after
 being severely wounded; once the group had crawled to a safer area,
 he tended to the survivors for five hours before they were all
 evacuated; he recovered from his injuries in Japan, and he later
 accepted an assignment there; along the way, he rose to the rank of
 specialist fifth class; and
 WHEREAS, In recognition of his courageous actions during the
 Vietnam War, Specialist Sasser was presented with the Medal of
 Honor by President Richard M. Nixon during a White House ceremony on
 March 7, 1969; his other military honors included the Distinguished
 Service Cross, Purple Heart, National Defense Service Medal,
 Vietnam Service Medal, and Republic of Vietnam Campaign Medal; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Sasser returned to civilian life in June 1969
 and continued his chemistry studies at Texas A&M University before
 accepting a position at a petrochemical refinery near Houston; he
 went on to enjoy a rewarding career as a decision review officer
 with the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs; and
 WHEREAS, Active in his community, Mr. Sasser was president of
 the Northwest Brazoria County Servicemen's Association and a member
 of New St. Philip Missionary Baptist Church; among his many
 achievements, he was inducted into the Texas A&M Hall of Honor in
 2013 and was awarded an honorary doctor of letters degree from the
 university; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Sasser shared a fulfilling marriage with his
 wife, Ethel, that spanned many years before her passing, and he took
 great pride in their three sons, Benjamin Sasser and Rossano
 Dickey, who preceded their father in death, and Billy Sasser; and
 WHEREAS, Clarence Sasser exemplified the highest ideals of
 the U.S. armed forces, and he leaves behind a record of service to
 his country that will continue to inspire all those who knew him;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Clarence Eugene Sasser and extend
 heartfelt sympathy to his loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Clarence Sasser.
 Vasut
 Barry
 Bonnen
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 49 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 10, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 49 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on March 19, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor