Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR58 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 7, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2025
Bill April 22, 2025