LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HJR165
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HJR165
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HJR165
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/07/2025
11:00 am
S/C on Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.026
HCR7
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1557
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB1608
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB2061
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
HB2201
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB2210
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB2426
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB2754
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HJR165
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB2513
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar