Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR175 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025 9:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Finance
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Finance
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/14/2025 9:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Finance
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Finance
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars