1 | 1 | | 89R1586 CMO-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Bucy H.J.R. No. 58 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A JOINT RESOLUTION |
---|
8 | 8 | | proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the use of money |
---|
9 | 9 | | in the state highway fund for transit-oriented projects. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, |
---|
12 | 12 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 7-a. Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation |
---|
14 | 14 | | and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all |
---|
15 | 15 | | refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from |
---|
16 | 16 | | motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross |
---|
17 | 17 | | production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used |
---|
18 | 18 | | to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the |
---|
19 | 19 | | sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing, |
---|
20 | 20 | | maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the |
---|
21 | 21 | | administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature |
---|
22 | 22 | | pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads; |
---|
23 | 23 | | and for constructing and maintaining transit-oriented projects |
---|
24 | 24 | | [the payment of the principal and interest on county and road |
---|
25 | 25 | | district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939, |
---|
26 | 26 | | and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of |
---|
27 | 27 | | the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law]; |
---|
28 | 28 | | provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from |
---|
29 | 29 | | the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund; |
---|
30 | 30 | | and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties |
---|
31 | 31 | | from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the |
---|
32 | 32 | | maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the |
---|
33 | 33 | | percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in |
---|
34 | 34 | | effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be |
---|
35 | 35 | | construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any |
---|
36 | 36 | | purpose. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. The following temporary provision is added to |
---|
38 | 38 | | the Texas Constitution: |
---|
39 | 39 | | TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies |
---|
40 | 40 | | to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature, |
---|
41 | 41 | | Regular Session, 2025, authorizing the use of money in the state |
---|
42 | 42 | | highway fund for transit-oriented projects. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (b) The amendments to Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this |
---|
44 | 44 | | constitution apply only in connection with a state fiscal biennium |
---|
45 | 45 | | that begins on or after September 1, 2027. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (c) This temporary provision expires September 2, 2027. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 3. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be |
---|
48 | 48 | | submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 4, 2025. |
---|
49 | 49 | | The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the |
---|
50 | 50 | | proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the use of |
---|
51 | 51 | | money in the state highway fund for transit-oriented projects." |
---|