Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR58 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R1586 CMO-D
 By: Bucy H.J.R. No. 58




 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the use of money
 in the state highway fund for transit-oriented projects.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7-a, Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a.  Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation
 and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all
 refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from
 motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
 sole purpose of acquiring rights-of-way, constructing,
 maintaining, and policing such public roadways, and for the
 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
 and for constructing and maintaining transit-oriented projects
 [the payment of the principal and interest on county and road
 district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2, 1939,
 and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment out of
 the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing law];
 provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue from
 the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School Fund;
 and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by counties
 from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less than the
 maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and the
 percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws in
 effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
 purpose.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2025, authorizing the use of money in the state
 highway fund for transit-oriented projects.
 (b)  The amendments to Section 7-a, Article VIII, of this
 constitution apply only in connection with a state fiscal biennium
 that begins on or after September 1, 2027.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires September 2, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 4, 2025.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the use of
 money in the state highway fund for transit-oriented projects."