Senate | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1546 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1925 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#602 | Journal Page: 1924 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#602 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1924 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 03/10/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 11/18/2024 | Filed |