Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR29 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/06/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 29




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew to
 a close with the passing of admired educator Albert Black of Austin
 on August 11, 2024, at the age of 75; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Crockett on May 4, 1949, Albert Black
 graduated from Paul Quinn College in 1970; he began his career as an
 elementary school teacher and principal in the Waco Independent
 School District; after earning a master's degree from Prairie View
 A&M University, he joined the Texas Education Agency and rose to
 become a senior program director; he retired following a noteworthy
 27-year tenure, but he was soon recruited by Child Inc, Head Start;
 as executive director, he guided the expansion of center capacity,
 implementation of innovative programs, and formation of strategic
 partnerships with local school districts, businesses, and
 nonprofit groups; the organization also realized improvements in
 performance measures and provided professional development
 opportunities for staff; in April 2024, he was named president of
 the Region VI Head Start Association Board; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Black married the former Kathy Gaither on
 April 17, 1981, and they were blessed with two children, Kaneisha
 and Elijah; eventually, his treasured family grew to include two
 grandchildren, Karis and Trey; he was predeceased by his beloved
 daughter; a man of faith, he led the Men's Ministry at Mt. Zion
 Baptist Church and served as Brotherhood Ministry president for the
 St. John District Brotherhood, the Missionary Baptist General
 Convention of Texas, and the National Baptist Convention of
 America; he also gave selflessly of his time and talents to mentor a
 host of young men; among numerous accolades, he received a 2024
 Presidential Volunteer Service Award from the Austin Black Business
 Journal & Community News; and
 WHEREAS, Albert Black enriched the lives of innumerable
 people, and although he will be deeply missed, those he left behind
 will cherish their memories of his warmth, kindness, and
 compassion; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Albert Black and
 extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family: to his wife,
 Kathy Gaither Black; to his son, Elijah Black; to his
 grandchildren, Karis and Trey; and to his many other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Albert
 Black.
 Cole
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 29 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on March 6, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House