Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR416 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 416




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life made rich through meaningful service drew to
 a close with the passing of Billy Ray Fowler of Throckmorton on
 February 16, 2025, at the age of 89; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Leslie and Sarah Fowler, Billy Ray Fowler
 was born in Goldthwaite on August 18, 1935, and he grew up with the
 companionship of three siblings, Sarah, Sue, and Paul; he graduated
 in 1953 from Throckmorton High School, and he went on to serve in
 the United States Army as a helicopter mechanic and as a member of
 the 82nd Airborne Division from 1957 to 1959; and
 WHEREAS, On January 15, 1958, Mr. Fowler married Patsy
 Yarbrough, and the couple shared in a fulfilling union that spanned
 67 years; he took great pride in his two sons, Ray and Gary, and over
 the years, his family grew to include six grandchildren and eight
 great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Fowler owned and operated a Conoco service
 station with his wife for more than three decades; deeply committed
 to his community, he enjoyed a 37-year tenure as the Throckmorton
 justice of the peace, and he was a member of the city council; he
 further gave of his time and talents to the volunteer fire
 department from 1969 to 2000, and he coached several Little League
 teams; a man of strong faith, he was an active member of the First
 Baptist Church of Throckmorton, where he taught Sunday School
 classes, and he also served on the board of the Throckmorton
 Cemetery; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to his family and his community,
 Billy Ray Fowler made a meaningful difference in the lives of his
 loved ones and fellow citizens alike, and he will long be remembered
 with deep affection by all who knew him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Billy Ray Fowler and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Patsy Fowler; to his sons, Ray Fowler and his wife, Gayle, and
 Gary Fowler and his wife, Kathy; to his grandchildren, Maryann
 Jernigan and her husband, Larry, Jay Fowler and his wife, Ashley,
 Amy Schroeder, Will Fowler and his wife, Melissa, David Fowler, and
 John Fowler and his wife, Shawnee; to his sisters, Sarah Morris and
 Sue Thurman; to his great-grandchildren; and to his other relatives
 and many friends, and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Billy Ray
 Fowler.
 Spiller
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 416 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 13, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House