Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR458 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 03/31/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 458




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of Larry Lyndon Beauchamp of Lawn on
 December 26, 2024, at the age of 86, concluded a remarkable life of
 service to the law enforcement community and to the State of Texas;
 and
 WHEREAS, The youngest child of P. G. and Bertie Beauchamp,
 Larry Beauchamp was born in Terry County on March 4, 1938, and he
 grew up with four siblings, P. G., James, Ada, and Joyce; following
 his graduation from Rochester High School, he exchanged wedding
 vows with his childhood sweetheart, the former Frankie Jo Sherley,
 on June 30, 1956; the couple shared a rewarding marriage that
 spanned 68 years, raising two children, James and John, and
 welcoming five grandchildren and four great-grandchildren into
 their treasured family; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Beauchamp began his 35-year law enforcement
 career with the Brownfield Police Department; after spending more
 than a decade there, he was stationed with the U.S. Army military
 police in Colorado, in Georgia, and at Fort Bliss in El Paso; he
 went on to serve as chief of the New Braunfels Police Department and
 as chief of legislative and capitol security for the Texas State
 Capitol complex; in addition, he was an investigator with the Texas
 Board of Investigators in Midland, the Haskell County District
 Attorney's Office, and the Travis County District Attorney's Office
 public integrity unit; he later served as an assistant commissioner
 with the Texas Department of Agriculture and as a construction
 manager with the Texas Veterans Land Board; a graduate of the
 Federal Bureau of Investigation National Academy, he distinguished
 himself over the years by earning a reputation for his commitment to
 professional development and ethical standards; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted family man and a dedicated public servant,
 Larry Beauchamp is deeply missed, but the integrity with which he
 lived his life will forever inspire all who had the good fortune to
 know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Larry Lyndon
 Beauchamp and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of his
 family: to his wife, Frankie Jo Beauchamp; to his sons, James Lyndon
 Beauchamp and John Presley Beauchamp; to his grandchildren,
 Kourtney Amelia Schopper, Caleigh Rea Popp, and Presley Suresh,
 Nila Jo, and Kareena Lyndon Beauchamp; to his great-grandchildren,
 Suzette and Betty Schopper and Pearl and Silas Popp; to his sisters,
 Ada Ruth Pope and Joyce Arlene Hester; and to his many other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Larry
 Beauchamp.
 Lambert
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 458 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 31, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House